AGE CONCERN NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pop-in-Parlour Cafe Open Tuesday to Friday 10am - 3.30pm Transport Service - 5 x Disabled Passenger Transport Vehicles. Advice Desk Hire of Wheelchairs Loan of other equipment for Disabled - Commodes etc.,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 12 June 1970: Standard registration
- 05 December 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SCUNTHORPE AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN (Previous name)
- THE SCUNTHORPE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ELDERLY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.23k | £59.57k | £82.59k | £63.27k | £63.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.35k | £56.75k | £79.06k | £67.66k | £66.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 13 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 16 September 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 17 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 23 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 12 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 16 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 01 December 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEBRUARY 1970 AMENDED 22 MAY 1984,23 MAY 1988,11 JUNE 1991, 15 OCTOBER 1996 AND NOVEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION CLAUSE 2)
Area of benefit
AS DEFINED IN OBJECTS (SEE CONSTITUTION CLAUSE 2)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window