Financial history E F AND M G HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 256453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £127.02k £126.67k £130.32k £142.33k £147.56k
Total expenditure £115.64k £123.57k £150.95k £148.64k £137.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A