Financial history QUEEN'S NURSES' BENEVOLENT FUND (INCORPORATING NURSES HOLDING THE NATIONAL DISTRICT NURSING CERTIFICATE)

Charity Number: 256462
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.61k £13.79k £13.73k £12.49k £3.72k
Total expenditure £92.29k £69.71k £63.32k £134.00k £266.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A