Financial history WINTHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 256505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £12.49k £1.20k £2.58k £9.90k £4.49k
Total expenditure £4.61k £3.61k £3.01k £17.02k £3.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A