WINTHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a Village Hall for the use of the inhabitants of the Parishes of Winthorpe, Holme and Langford without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings and leisure time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 November 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT PARK MCCLYMONT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mark William Brown | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Faith Conning | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lee Cammack | Trustee | 27 November 2015 |
|
|||||
JOAN MARY LORD | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.49k | £1.20k | £2.58k | £9.90k | £4.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.61k | £3.61k | £3.01k | £17.02k | £3.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 December 2022 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 December 2022 | 512 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23 SEPTEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF WINTHORPE, HOLME AND LANGFORD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WINTHORPE HOLME AND LANGFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Gainsborough Road
Winthorpe
NEWARK
NG24 2NR
- Phone:
- 07968855448
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window