Financial history CAUSEWAY LAND FUND AND OTHER CHARITIES

Charity number: 256513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £816 £697 £609 £1.36k £833
Total expenditure £491 £458 £595 £727 £730
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A