OLVESTON CHURCH LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help maintain the existing structure of St Mary's Olveston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 31 July 1968: Standard registration
- OLVESTON CHURCH BUILDING TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FRANCIS BERNARD GUNNERY | Chair |
|
||||||
PAUL DAVID HARROD | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ann Macaskill | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward William Bernard Gunnery | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WRIGHT | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|||||
TESSA JEAN VICTORIA FLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.90k | £4.77k | £5.59k | £6.21k | £6.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.56k | £5.06k | £5.10k | £5.08k | £6.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 December 2020 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
P.R. VOL. 17 PAGE 400
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL MAINTENANCE OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF OLVESTON
Area of benefit
OLVESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROCK HOUSE
ELBERTON
OLVESTON
BRISTOL
BS35 4AQ
- Phone:
- 01454413225
- Email:
- jfbgunnery@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window