T F C FROST CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives grants and fellowships for research into eye disease through recognised University and Hospital research departments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 30 August 1968: Standard registration
- THE FROST TRUST (Working name)
- T F C FROST SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS FROST FCA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Harry Petrushkin FRCP | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Khawaja FRCophth | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
KEITH BARTON | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MILLER MD FRCS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ELIZABETH GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOHN MARSHALL MBE BSC | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.32k | £39.09k | £1.02m | £126.02k | £101.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.06k | £38.07k | £82.80k | £105.29k | £92.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £1.02m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £82.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £35.31k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £47.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1966, AS AMENDED 24TH NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND REMEDIES OF BLINDNESS AND FOR THE RELIEF OF BLIND PERSONS OR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DISEASES OF THE EYE AND IN SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE SETTLOR OR THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 TORRINGTON RD
CLAYGATE
ESHER
SURREY
KT10 0SA
- Phone:
- 01372465378
- Email:
- holmes_and_co@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window