WORCESTERSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our principal activities are: the acquisition and management of nature reserves; the collection and dissemination of biological data; the provision of advice and comment to authorities and land-managers; and the promotion of wildlife conservation through education programmes. The principal activity of the Trust's subsidiary trading company is that of consultancy services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,550,354
Donations and legacies | £1.36m | |
Charitable activities | £820.56k | |
Other trading activities | £223.29k | |
Investments | £103.14k | |
Other | £44.22k |
Total expenditure:
£2,556,300
Raising funds | £717.56k | |
Charitable activities | £1.84m | |
Other | £0 |
£125,819 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £60,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £368,799 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £717.56k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.84m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £717.56k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.84m | |
Retained for future use | £119.87k |
People

36 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
480 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 31 July 1969: Standard registration
- THE WORCESTERSHIRE NATURE CONSERVATION TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christianne Tipping | Chair | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Lyndon Bracewell | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Locke | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Devries | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Muir | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Pawley | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Christopher Coubrough Meikle | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Patricia Gildea | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Forecast | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Greensmith | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BLAKISTON | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Cory | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Bob Gillmor | Trustee | 16 May 2001 |
|
|||||
Dr PETER RICHARD HOLMES | Trustee | 12 November 1997 |
|
|
||||
HARRY GREEN | Trustee | 18 November 1992 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.65m | £2.60m | £2.79m | £2.92m | £2.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91m | £2.12m | £2.17m | £2.31m | £2.56m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £19.84k | £109.01k | £140.22k | £60.39k | £60.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £286.31k | £314.27k | £381.32k | £313.40k | £368.80k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.88m | £1.84m | £1.83m | £1.82m | £1.36m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £347.68k | £336.09k | £315.55k | £352.65k | £223.29k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £309.62k | £314.89k | £521.45k | £616.09k | £820.56k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £71.67k | £63.84k | £78.39k | £83.48k | £103.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £45.30k | £41.96k | £52.29k | £42.77k | £44.22k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £572.24k | £158.04k | £218.53k | £224.98k | £354.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.19m | £1.38m | £1.36m | £1.53m | £1.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £723.73k | £738.49k | £812.64k | £785.37k | £717.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.49k | £8.58k | £9.77k | £10.99k | £9.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £9.70k | £11.51k | £13.51k | £16.48k | £19.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.14m | £12.16m | £13.12m | £13.73m | £13.85m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.50m | £3.61m | £3.56m | £3.27m | £3.39m | |
|
Other assets | £1.27m | £1.10m | £814.78k | £790.42k | £731.07k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£128.79k | -£82.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £98.86k | £92.59k | £185.49k | £150.66k | £216.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 28TH MARCH 1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED THE 15TH APRIL 1969 AND THE 18TH MAY 1971 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
3.THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: 3.1.TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF NATURE RESERVES WHICH SHALL BE OWNED, MAINTAINED OR MANAGED BY THE TRUST. 3.2.TO RESTORE, CREATE, STUDY AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION OF PLACES OF ZOOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, MYCOLOGICAL, ECOLOGICAL, GEOLOGICAL, OR GENERAL SCIENTIFIC INTEREST. 3.3.TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND CARRY OUT STUDY AND RESEARCH FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE NATURAL SCIENCES, TO MAKE GRANTS OR DONATIONS FOR SUCH PURPOSES AND TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT THE RECORDING AND PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. 3.4.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF BIODIVERSITY CONSERVATION AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOWER SMITE FARM
SMITE HILL
HINDLIP
WORCESTER
WR3 8SZ
- Phone:
- 01905754919
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window