OVERCOMER LITERATURE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 256633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust prints and distributes a magazine, "The Overcomer", three times a year. In March July and November. The magazine is a Christian publication and is sent to readers in many parts of the world. We do not distribute funds or do any other charitable acts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £20,029
Total expenditure: £20,925

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 September 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVD GRAHAM JOHN HOSLETT BSC BD Chair
WESTBOROUGH UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
PARACLETE CHRISTIAN NETWORK INTERNATIONAL.
Received: On time
Mark McNaughton Trustee 10 April 2013
THE RECONCILIATION TRUST
Received: On time
REVD MIKE DILLY Trustee
None on record
REVEREND MARK LENSON WEEDEN Trustee
LIVING WORD MINISTRIES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.49k £11.62k £12.11k £16.06k £20.03k
Total expenditure £19.95k £16.08k £16.04k £20.72k £20.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 22 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
129 Sandgate
Swindon
SN3 4HJ
Phone:
01793976130