NORTH TAMERTON VICTORY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are in the process of modernising Hall. Stage 1: replacing heating, electrics, insulation, french windows and complete redecoration now complete. Stage 2 kitchen extension and redecoration coming soon. Burns night, quiz night, craft and produce show, skittles, summer fairs, pancake day, wakes, private parties among many activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 12 June 1970: Standard registration
- NORTH TAMERTON VICTORY HALL (Working name)
- PARISH HALL (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Peter Harper | Chair | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Bridle | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Jane Williams | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Griffin | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Turnock | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Williams | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Britton | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.94k | £17.93k | £4.31k | £1.73k | £7.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.85k | £10.71k | £15.35k | £1.98k | £29.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 12TH MARCH 1970 as amended on 09 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH TAMERTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
NORTH TAMERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitethorn
North Tamerton
HOLSWORTHY
Devon
EX22 6RX
- Phone:
- 01409271464
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window