NOTTINGHAMSHIRE CONSTABULARY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable the fund to carry out its purpose namely A) To assist by monetary grants such members of the fund and their widows, children and dependants as may be in necessitous or impoverished circumstances. B) To make grants to police charities and subscriptions to such other charities as the trustees may decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 05 September 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Bull | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Cooper | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Murray | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL KENNEDY | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Tom Hill | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Skelton | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Cameron JP | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GERALD CLOWES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN BURDUS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.24k | £22.77k | £24.98k | £21.91k | £44.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.31k | £18.66k | £19.74k | £16.58k | £31.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 23 AUGUST 1968 AS AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1978 AND 23 OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
A) TO ASSIST BY MONETARY GRANTS SUCH MEMBERS OF THE FUND AND THEIR WIDOWS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS, AS MAY BE IN NECESSITOUS OR IMPOVERISHED CIRCUMSTANCES. B) TO MAKE GRANTS TO POLICE CHARITIES AND SUBSCRIPTIONS TO SUCH OTHER CHARITIES AS THE COMMITTEE MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nottinghamshire Constabulary
Police Station
Radford Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 5GX
- Phone:
- 07595004734
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window