THE RALPH CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
None
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2019
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RALPH BRABANT CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA CLARK JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.55k | £18.55k | £46.56k | £3.64k | £3.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.47k | £16.59k | £11.49k | £13.84k | £18.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 541 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 541 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 906 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 906 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1271 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1271 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1636 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1636 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 21ST DECEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OR FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITIONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL HOUSE
MARSHALLS ELM
STREET
BA16 0TY
- Phone:
- 01458442948
- Email:
- bclark58@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window