ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income used for the maintenance of the Fox and Goose, Sancroft Hall (both church properties), and the maintenance and adornment of the fabric of St Peter and St Paul Church of England Church, Fressingfield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Suffolk
Governance
- 08 October 1968: Standard registration
- Fressingfield Ecclesiastical Charity (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Susan Loxton | Chair | 01 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
Fressingfield PCC | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.68k | £17.19k | £13.53k | £15.00k | £18.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.39k | £100.46k | £12.32k | £9.21k | £5.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
P.R. 22 P. 154 - APPORTIONMENT ORDER OF THE 24TH JUNE 1897
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF SAINT PETER SAINT PAUL, FRESSINGFIELD.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF FRESSINGFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RECTORY
DOCTORS LANE
STRADBROKE
EYE
IP21 5HU
- Phone:
- 01379 388493
- Website:
-
sancroftbeneficechurches.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window