HOVE AND PORTSLADE AID IN SICKNESS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 257002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the benefit of those who live within the old boundaries of Hove or Portslade who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped or infirm.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £14,078
Total expenditure: £12,650

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 1970: Standard registration
  • 21 February 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • AIS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Catriona Cumming Trustee 27 September 2024
ALL SAINTS HOVE CHORAL TRUST
Received: On time
Rev David Swyer Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Audrey Good Trustee 31 March 2021
DOROTHY KATHLEEN JACKSON CHARITY
Received: On time
MARGARET AND ALFRED DENNY CHRISTMAS CHARITY
Received: On time
Carmen Appich Trustee 13 June 2019
BRIGHTON YOGA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Bryan Dennis Sanders Trustee 13 June 2019
DOROTHY KATHLEEN JACKSON CHARITY
Received: On time
MARGARET AND ALFRED DENNY CHRISTMAS CHARITY
Received: On time
Lady Joyce Brenda Gould Trustee 13 June 2019
THE HANGLETON & KNOLL PROJECT
Received: On time
Cllr. Leslie Arthur Hamilton Trustee 12 September 2014
MARGARET AND ALFRED DENNY CHRISTMAS CHARITY
Received: On time
CATHERINE MARTIN TRUST
Received: On time
KEREN HANCOX Trustee
BRIGHTON AND HOVE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.83k £11.35k £12.44k £13.41k £14.08k
Total expenditure £17.26k £15.82k £13.75k £10.43k £12.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 13 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 3 SEPT. 1962
Charitable objects
TO BE USED FOR THE GENERAL COMFORT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE NURSES OF THE FORMER HOVE AND PORTSLADE BRANCH OF THE QUEENS NURSES.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF HOVE AND URBAN DISTRICT OF PORTSLADE BY SEA
Registration history
  • 07 September 1970 : Standard registration
  • 21 February 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
2 Edgehill Way
Portslade
BRIGHTON
BN41 2PU
Phone:
07784771014
Website:

No information available