UXBRIDGE AND HILLINGDON LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 257127
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Hillingdon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 October 1968: Standard registration
  • 07 August 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not submitted