THE FASHION & TEXTILE CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fashion & Textile Children's Trust offers grants to families working in the UK fashion or textile industry. Our grants cover the cost of essential items including school uniform, bedding and specialist items including mobility equipment. We also provide funding towards the cost of educational support, therapies and counselling, where no state funding is available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 October 1968: Standard registration
- THE TEXTILE INDUSTRY'S CHILDREN'S TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Taylor | Chair | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Campbell | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Phil Cooke | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alia Gerar | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Woodward | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne SECUNDA | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bready | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Becker | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Elias | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MIKE TROTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £371.83k | £345.92k | £315.05k | £359.12k | £426.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £811.74k | £823.46k | £698.86k | £812.15k | £848.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 SEPT 1968, AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF THE C.C. DATED 18 DEC 1995 & 3O MAR 1999, SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 30 JUL 2003. / DIRECTION UNDER 96(6) FOR ACCOUNTING PURPOSES WITH 312558 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 21 JUL 2010.
Charitable objects
A) THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF ANY PERSONS PRESENTLY OR FORMERLY EMPLOYED IN THE TEXTILE AND ALLIED TRADES WHO SHALL BE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG CHILDREN OF ANY PERSONS PRESENTLY OR FORMERLY EMPLOYED AS AFORESAID. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF DECLARATION OF TRUST).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fashion & Textile Children's Trust
44 Southampton Buildings
Holborn
London
WC2A 1AP
- Phone:
- 03001239002
- Email:
- anna@ftct.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window