LONDON STEPNEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 257166
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Holding regular twice weekly meetiongs for the public worship of God and Bibel study. Futher, most congregation members have assisted by sharing regularly in preaching the good news of God's kingdom and teaching principles of Christian living including respect for secular authority, persons and property, the maintainance of personal morality and family values, and other facets of Christianity

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £9,865
Total expenditure: £8,035

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 November 1968: Standard registration
  • 01 June 2016: Funds received from 1069923 LONDON, BENGALI CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
  • 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STEPNEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES (Working name)
  • STEPNEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (Working name)
  • LONDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES STEPNEY UNIT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.56k £9.46k £8.62k £10.36k £9.87k
Total expenditure £8.54k £10.14k £8.16k £7.68k £8.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required