PULHAM ST. MARY TOWN ESTATE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1/5 for education, 1/5 for church & 3/5 for the needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 06 November 1968: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- PULHAM ST MARY VILLAGE CHARITIES (Working name)
- TOWN ESTATE (Working name)
- THE TOWN ESTATE (ESTATE CHARITY) (Previous name)
- TOWN ESTATE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.51k | £1.23k | £2.01k | £1.68k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71k | £1.93k | £1.84k | £1.42k | £1.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 06 February 2009 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 05 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 19 February 2008 | 19 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 26TH JULY 1907
Charitable objects
$10 PER ANNUM TO THE TOWN ESTATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION $10 9S 0D ($10.45) PER ANNUM TO THE TOWN ESTATE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY. RESIDUE OF INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN THE RELIEF OF THE POOR IN THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF PULHAM ST. MARY THE VIRGIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window