PILGRIMS' HALL FELLOWSHIP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Retreat and Conference Centre / Pastoral Care / Seminars / Training Courses / Bible Teaching / Community Support / Christian Bookshop and Resources
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 12 November 1968: Standard registration
- PILGRIMS HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Dodgson | Chair | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Alltimes | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Wilkinson | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bernard John Elkin | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN JOHN GILDERSON | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE COUSINS | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.50k | £217.95k | £77.78k | £100.34k | £114.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.34k | £127.92k | £131.88k | £117.12k | £130.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £15.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH OCTOBER 1968
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND EXTEND THE KINGDOM OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST BY PROVIDING LAY PEOLE WITH THEOLOGICAL DEVOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL TEACHING AND TRAINING IN CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRACTICE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pilgrims Hall
Ongar Road
Pilgrims Hatch
Brentwood
CM15 9SA
- Phone:
- 01277372206
- Email:
- team@pilgrimshall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window