Financial history EUROPEAN CULTURAL FOUNDATION (UK COMMITTEE)

Charity Number: 257273
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £7.18k £15.75k £7.37k £5.64k £250
Total expenditure £9.66k £11.63k £8.75k £7.49k £2.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A