Financial history JOHNSON AND FOWNES CHARITY

Charity number: 257292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.89k £3.16k £3.06k £2.31k £3.46k
Total expenditure £2.88k £3.39k £3.15k £2.91k £2.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A