Trustees THE INSTITUTION OF AGRICULTURAL ENGINEERS
Charity number: 257303

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN CONSTABLE | Chair | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Moore FIAgrE | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Clare Butler Ellis FIAgrE | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Dudley King AMIAgrE | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert William Simmons | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Whiting | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bruce Donaldson Grieve | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kit Frederic Peter Franklin | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Francis Hemingway | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jane Rickson FIAgrE | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR MACOLM ST JOHN CARR-WEST FIAgrE | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MERRALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.