CHILTERNS DOG RESCUE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chilterns Dog Rescue Society rescues and rehomes dogs who no longer have a home in England & Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- West Berkshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 September 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MALCOLM LEWIS | Chair | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ian Mash | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Linda Healy | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steve Cherry | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
NEIL PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £676.08k | £621.23k | £324.77k | £442.75k | £365.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £263.48k | £290.02k | £340.37k | £374.35k | £426.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.57k | £5.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £583.61k | £570.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £52.27k | £27.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £39.37k | £21.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £837 | £1.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £489.27k | £446.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £254.87k | £288.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £8.62k | £1.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.48k | £5.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 20TH JUNE 2000 AMENDED 28/2/2006 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF HOMELESSNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES, ILL-USAGE OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO AND SUFFERING AMONG DOGS.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHILTERNS DOG RESCUE SOCIETY
BROMLEY HEIGHTS
CHIVERY
TRING
HP23 6LD
- Phone:
- 01296623885
- Email:
- enquiries@cdrs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window