THE PENNY IN THE POUND FUND CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide amenity facilities to patients in hospital under the care of health related charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 16 January 1969: Standard registration
- 12 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.84k | £8.11k | £3.37k | £2.38k | £18.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.81k | £112.17k | £48.29k | £166.61k | £29.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 11 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 28 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 22 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 29 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 11 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 11 June 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH DECEMBER 1968 AND SCHEME OF THE 4TH JULY 1974
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL KNOWLEDGE.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window