Accounts and annual returns MARKET HARBOROUGH DRAMA SOCIETY

Charity Number: 257746
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 13 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 13 October 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2014 21 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 21 November 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2013 27 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 27 November 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2012 19 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 19 November 2012 On Time