Governing document MARKET HARBOROUGH DRAMA SOCIETY
Charity Number: 257746
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/08/1968 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 09/08/2009 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT, STUDY AND PRACTICE OF DRAMATIC ART, IN ALL ITS FORMS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE DISTRICT OF MARKET HARBOROUGH AND ELSEWHERE (FOR FURTHER DESCRIPTION, SEE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DISTRICT OF MARKET HARBOROUGH AND ELSEWHERE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.