Governing document THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF MANAGEMENT ACCOUNTANTS' GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Charity number: 257750

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED THE 11TH NOVEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS DATED THE 9TH NOVEMBER 1972, 29TH SEPTEMBER 1988, 28TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 30 JULY 2010.
Charitable objects
MAKING CONTRIBUTIONS DONATIONS OR OTHER PAYMENTS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCOUNTANCY AND OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COUNCIL OF THE INSTITUTE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.