ABBEYFIELD BRAINTREE, BOCKING AND FELSTED SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Abbeyfield Braintree Bocking and Felsted Society Limited is a charitable company registered social housing provider. The Society operates two very sheltered housing schemes, an extra care scheme and a retirement village, providing accommodation, care and companionship for older people who chose not to live alone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

107 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 12 February 1969: Standard registration
- 09 June 2016: Funds received from 259676 THE ABBEYFIELD, FELSTED, SOCIETY LIMITED
- THE ABBEYFIELD BRAINTREE AND BOCKING SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY MICHAEL ST JOHN CRAMPHORN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul David Archer | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Barry | Trustee | 22 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Havis | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Quaife | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN NORGETT | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA GUEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SUMMERSGILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.49m | £1.53m | £1.67m | £3.20m | £3.84m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26m | £1.35m | £1.51m | £3.41m | £3.60m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £35.24k | £4.80k | £9.86k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £35.75k | £14.20k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.26m | £1.35m | £1.51m | £3.41m | £3.60m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.49k | £5.99k | £5.81k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.33m | £21.34m | £30.64m | £30.74m | £30.32m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.49m | £80.35k | £324.35k | £2.18m | £2.10m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.51m | £15.88m | £25.23m | £27.36m | £26.57m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JANUARY 1969 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR PEOPLE OF ALL CLASSES, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION AND FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
BRAINTREE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbeyfield Society
338-340 Coggeshall Road
BRAINTREE
Essex
CM7 9EH
- Phone:
- 01376 402065
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window