ST AUSTELL RIFLE AND PISTOL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide facilities and instruction for shooters of all abilities to enable and encourage participation in a sport requiring both physical and mental training. We have indoor 10m. / 25 yd. and outdoor 50m. / 100 yd. ranges and equipment to provide shooting for the disabled and partially sighted. All our activities are carried out under the auspices of the National Smallbore Rifle Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 18 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander David Lang | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR GREN MATTA | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP HAMMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL YEOMANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.90k | £3.90k | £10.06k | £17.79k | £19.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.58k | £2.61k | £7.86k | £15.79k | £16.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 May 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 1967 AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 1983, 21 OCTOBER 2008 AND 20 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE SKILL IN RIFLE AND PISTOL SHOOTING BY PROVIDING INSTRUCTION AND PRACTICE IN THE USE OF THE RIFLE AND PISTOL TO ANY OF HER MAJESTY'S SUBJECTS SO THAT THEY WILL BE BETTER FITTED TO SERVE THEIR COUNTRY IN THE ARMED FORCES, TERRITORIAL ARMY OR ANY OTHER ORGANISATION IN WHICH THEIR SERVICES MAY BE REQUIRED IN THE DEFENCE OF THE REALM IN TIMES OF PERIL.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Austell Rifle Club
Trevarthian Road
ST. AUSTELL
Cornwall
PL25 4BT
- Phone:
- 07724500528
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window