Financial history HAZELWOOD CHAPEL (PROCEEDS OF SALE) FUND

Charity Number: 257840
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £10 £11 £13 £11 £266
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £357
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A