EAST GRINSTEAD SOCIETY

Charity number: 257870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Monitors planning applications and cares for buildings and amenities in the town and surroundings

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £2,674
Total expenditure: £2,153

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Baldwin Mr Chair 18 October 2019
None on record
Alan Ward Trustee 18 October 2017
None on record
Michael Lyons Trustee 24 May 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.01k £2.44k £75 £4.71k £2.67k
Total expenditure £1.78k £1.08k £2.46k £6.56k £2.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 November 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Durkins Road
East Grinstead
RH19 2ER
Phone:
07831591307