HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICES (HULL AND EAST RIDING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hospital broadcasting service for Hull & East Yorkshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 28 April 1969: Standard registration
- KINGSTOWN RADIO (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Sweeney | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Faulder | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Robinson Robinson | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £9.84k | £6.96k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £2.96k | £6.61k | £1.33k | £3.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/02/1969 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/07/1971 AS AMENDED ON 03/08/2005 AS AMENDED ON 03/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN HULL AND THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, OLD PEOPLES HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
HULL AND EAST RIDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 ST. PHILIPS ROAD
KEYINGHAM
HULL
HU12 9TD
- Phone:
- 01964622742
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window