THE BOLTONS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal aims and objectives of the Trust are: i) the pursuit, understanding and reduction of innocent suffering; ii) the support for education, research and welfare projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 February 1969: Standard registration
- CHARLOTTE LYN BERNSTEIN CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLOTTE ALBUQUERQUE | Chair | 04 April 1967 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BALDOCK | Trustee | 25 October 2007 |
|
|||||
SEAN ALBUQUERQUE | Trustee | 25 October 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.96k | £24.11k | £25.64k | £27.73k | £31.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.41k | £83.12k | £87.49k | £45.76k | £45.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 4TH APRIL 1967 AND RESOLUTION OF 20TH NOVEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILSTED LANGDON
FRESHFORD HOUSE
REDCLIFFE WAY
BRISTOL
BS1 6NL
- Phone:
- 01179452500
- Email:
- ADVICE@MILSTED-LANGDON.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window