THE FLETCHERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates within the guidelines set down in its 1968 Deed of Trust to relieve poverty and hardship. Primarily supports archery for the disabled through grants to organisations and individuals. Makes grants to some City of London based Charities and to a few national charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 April 1969: Standard registration
- 27 April 2023: Funds received from 1143875 THE ARCHERY FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Campbell McMillan | Chair | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip Shears KC | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Kenneth Robert MacLellan | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.21k | £31.88k | £61.56k | £60.78k | £52.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.85k | £26.25k | £46.67k | £37.59k | £68.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 04 January 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 04 January 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH NOVEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
(A) RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST LIVERYMEN OR FREEMAN OF WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FLETCHERS OF CITY OF LONDON. (B) RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THOSE ENGAGED OR FORMERLY ENGAGED IN THE TRADE OR MANUFACTURE OF ARROWS. (C) TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Greenhurst Drive
EAST GRINSTEAD
West Sussex
RH19 3NE
- Phone:
- 07812250820
- Email:
- clerk@fletchers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window