CHALE SCOUTS HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trustees hold ownership of local wooden hut for use for scouting activities run by local scout troop or in the case of this troop disbanding, the hut or its residual asset will be available to benefit the young people of Chale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 11 June 1969: Standard registration
- 04 October 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 04 October 2013: Funds transferred to 1150297 CHALE RECREATION GROUND LTD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18 | £26 | £53 | £69.31k | £18 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.03k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 10 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 23 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 23 April 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 24 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 13 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH AUGUST 1934 TRUST DEED AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/08/1934 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO MAKE FINANCIAL CONTRIBUTION TO A CHARITY REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION TO ASSIST IN THE ACQUISITION OR CONSTRUCTION OF PREMISES TO BE USED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POPULATION OF THE PARISH OF CHALE IN THE ISLE OF WIGHT AND, IN PARTICULAR, FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SAID PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHALE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window