HAZLEMERE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hazlemere Community Association accomodates around 1,000 users per week. Activities within our Community Centre include:- Keep Fit/Aerobic groups, Yoga, Mother & Toddler Groups, Baby groups, Amateur Dramatics, various sport related activities, dancing for adults and children, a "Pop In" centre for the elderly, Blind and partially sighted group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £9,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 03 March 1969: Standard registration
- 14 September 2021: Funds received from 1024960 HAZLEMERE PARENT AND TODDLER CLUB
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Peter Simpson | Chair | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Taylor | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judy Grist | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Norman Stanley Large | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.77k | £66.59k | £66.68k | £76.64k | £85.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.82k | £68.65k | £90.76k | £96.90k | £100.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.46k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £9.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 February 2025 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 February 2025 | 208 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 239 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2023 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 October 2023 | 441 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 October 2021 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 October 2021 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH NOVEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED ON 17TH MAY 1976 AS AMENDED AT SGM 22 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HAZLEMERE AND THE ADJOINING PARISHES OF CHEPPING WYCOMBE, HUGHENDEN, LITTLE MISSENDEN AND PENN (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTAITON RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS. C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE.
Area of benefit
HAZLEMERE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hazelemere Community Association
Rose Avenue
Hazlemere
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP15 7UB
- Phone:
- 01494815180
- Email:
- office@hcacommunity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window