THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR RESTORATIVE DENTISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society promotes high standards in Restorative Dentistry through both meetings and publications and encourages continuing education. Research prizes are awarded and ongoing education projects. Particular interest is given to promoting high quality restorative dentistry for all communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 April 1969: Standard registration
- B S R D (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Katherine Peta Heffernan | Chair | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Paul Jerreat | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lola Bomfim | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex Rovira-Wilde | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Tabor | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter James Baker | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ridah Hasan | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Truman | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kalpesh Bavisha | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philippa Jane Hoyle | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sapna Patel | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Green | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Jonathan Gabe | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.65k | £67.65k | £32.53k | £49.58k | £45.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.89k | £58.61k | £24.42k | £43.35k | £50.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BYE LAWS ADOPTED 17TH JANUARY 1969
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO RESTORATIVE DENTISTRY AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (B) TO INSTRUCT AND ADVISE DENTAL PRACTITIONERS IN THE PRACTICE OF RESTORATIVE DENTISTRY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 Kings Avenue
WOODFORD GREEN
Essex
IG8 0JG
- Phone:
- 07951727712
- Email:
- jamestsmith@me.com
- Website:
-
bsrd.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window