Accounts and annual returns CLEE HILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 258189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 05 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 05 March 2025 339 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 05 March 2025 705 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required