Financial history CLEE HILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 258189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £12.94k £10.29k £9.34k £2.59k £2.48k
Total expenditure £3.09k £4.35k £3.00k £4.40k £4.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £8.75k N/A N/A N/A