SHREE GEETA BHAWAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are mainly involved in hindu religious activities and do not have any political affinity. We have regular classes for young children for development of Hindi language. We run an over 50 club for elders to encourage them to understand social and health issues. We celebrate various Hindu festivals like Diwali, Janmasthmi, Holi etc where large number of devotees take part.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 20 June 1969: Standard registration
- SHRI GEETA BHAWAN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohinder Paul Jagota | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vikram Kapoor | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jyoti Basandrai | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jagdish Chander Sharma | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Kumar Sudera | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kamlesh Prem Lata Duggal | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rohit Gautam | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Kalia | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mukesh Murria | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sanju Sharma | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Raj Kumar | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
NARESH KUMAR SABHARWAL | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arun Sinha | Trustee | 30 October 2015 |
|
|||||
KUSUM LATA BHANOT | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
HARSHAD TRIVEDI | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £381.50k | £143.72k | £318.64k | £443.28k | £325.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £274.75k | £182.89k | £178.55k | £287.68k | £285.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/09/1968 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/1985 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/1999 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shree Geeta Bhawan
107-117 Heathfield Road
Handsworth
BIRMINGHAM
B19 1HL
- Phone:
- 0121 554 4120
- Email:
- INFO@SHREEGEETABHAWAN.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window