DAWLISH AMATEUR REPERTORY COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity puts on a wide variety of drama productions at the Shaftesbury Theatre, Dawlish. It maintains the theatre for the benefit of the people of Dawlish and the surrounding district and makes it available for use by other organisations, including youth groups, schools, musical theatre, exhibitions, amateur and professional companies and other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 22 April 1970: Standard registration
- 29 October 2019: Funds received from 221305 THE CENTRE CLUB
- DAWLISH REP (Working name)
- SHAFTESBURY THEATRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Goldsworthy | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Joanna Mary Godwin | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Matanle-Mockridge | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Angove | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Ewart | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Swift | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Marilyn Brimacombe | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Geoffrey Paine | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev ALAN LEONARD SMITH | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SOPHIE BRIMACOMBE | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Douglas Macklin | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.57k | £31.84k | £46.38k | £62.78k | £70.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.93k | £51.78k | £54.00k | £68.18k | £81.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.10k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/04/1970 as amended on 06 Nov 2018 as amended on 08 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART. TO MAKE OCCASIONAL SMALL DONATIONS TO CHARITIES ESTABLISHED FOR OTHER OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
DAWLISH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shaftesbury Theatre
Brunswick Place
DAWLISH
Devon
EX7 9PB
- Phone:
- 01626863061
- Email:
- info@dawlishrep.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window