ALLOTMENTS FOR THE LABOURING POOR

Charity number: 258227
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Allottment gardens for members of the Parish

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £5,608
Total expenditure: £212

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gavin Hyatt Chair 14 October 2024
JOAN SMITH'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Scott Cleaveley Trustee 11 November 2024
JOAN SMITH'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Julie Sullivan Trustee 09 May 2023
JOAN SMITH'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Meena Patel Trustee 09 May 2023
JOAN SMITH'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
GRAHAM KNAGGS Trustee 26 September 2013
JOAN SMITH'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
ANDREW SMITH Trustee
JOAN SMITH'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £2.68k £2.95k £2.73k £2.90k £5.61k
Total expenditure £0 £199 £546 £9.90k £212
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Huggett Close
CARTERTON
Oxfordshire
OX18 3FR
Phone:
07928594657