THE FRIENDS OF ST MARK'S HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial /practical assistance to individual patients or family members, for example, for transport or accommodation costs. Provision of equipment not available on the NHS. Maintenance of the garden.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 April 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Mary Evans | Chair | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Mark Darby Nightingale | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rose Maria Gonzalez | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorrie Margaret Baker | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice Diane Ferrari | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PALMER | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Wraight | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Rodrigues | Trustee | 05 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SOLVEIG WILSON | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNY THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET HAMMERSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.57k | £106.06k | £3.16k | £1.22k | £1.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.95k | £101.38k | £3.21k | £2.27k | £1.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1971 AND REVISED 20 JUNE 1997, 24 JUNE 1998 AND 22 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF ST. MARK'S HOSPITAL NORTHWICK PARK, WATFORD ROAD,HARROW HA1 3UJ, (FORMERLY AT CITY ROAD LONDON EC1V 2PS) WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OF ST.MARK'S HOSPITAL
ROOM ENT-25, ST MARK'S HOSPITAL
ACTON LANE
LONDON
NW10 7NS
- Phone:
- 020 8453 2519
- Email:
- friendsofsm@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window