THE BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was set up for the advancement of education in veterinary science, but is currently dormant, as the charity relies on donations from BVA. A subsidiary charity, the BVA Staff Benevolent Fund, was set up to help current and ex-BVA employees and dependents in time of financial need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 March 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Mullineaux | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|||||
MR TED CHANDLER BVETMED FRCVS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41 | £18 | £2 | £44 | £247 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF CHARITABLE TRUST DATED 18 DECEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
(I) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN VETERINARY SCIENCE MEDICINE OR SURGERY. (II) TO RESEARCH IN THE FIELDS OF VETERINARY SCIENCE, MEDICINE OR SURGERY AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (III) RELIEF OF SUFFERING IN ANIMALS AND THE PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT AND PURITY OF BREEDS OF ANIMALS USEFUL TO MAN. (IV) GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH VETERINARY SCIENCE MEDICINE OR SURGERY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 25 March 1991 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION
7 MANSFIELD STREET
LONDON
W1G 9NQ
- Phone:
- 02076366541
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window