ROBERT WATCHORN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance to promote religion within the Alfreton district whether this being an organisation or individual. To provide finance to Watchorn Methodst Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 12 June 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Payandeh | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Maskell Peters | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL WING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.20k | £43.47k | £20.57k | £202.45k | £10.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.26k | £42.52k | £20.05k | £208.33k | £6.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1103 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH JUNE 1938
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST TOWARDS ANY CHARITABLE WORK, PROJECT, OR UNDERTAKING FOR THE GOOD OF THE PEOPLE OF THE PARISH OF ALFRETON AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE AFORESAID TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF THE MINISTER OF THE WATCHORN MEMORIAL METHODIST CHURCH AT ALFRETON AND FOR THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE SAID CHURCH, THE CHURCHYARD AND OTHER PROPERTIES OF THE CHURCH TRUST.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ALFRETON,
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hill Top Farm
Hayes Lane
Swanwick
ALFRETON
DE55 1AT
- Phone:
- 01773526012
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window