INSTITUTE FOR EMPLOYMENT STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Institute's mission is to help bring about sustainable improvements in employment policy and HR management for the benefit of all. The Institute works with government departments, agencies, professional and employee bodies, and employers, and disseminates and shares knowledge widely; its expertise is available to all through research, consultancy, publications and the Internet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,004,762
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.96m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £27.74k | |
Other | £21.15k |
Total expenditure:
£3,921,539
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.92m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,340,148 from 19 government contract(s) and £286,754 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.92m | |
Retained for future use | £83.22k |
People

52 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 April 1969: Standard registration
- 18 March 2025: Funds received from 200468 INVOLVEMENT AND PARTICIPATION ASSOCIATION
- I E S (Working name)
- INSTITUTE OF MANPOWER STUDIES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Denis Elliott | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Graham Steel | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
LINDA GREGORY | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Emma Stewart | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAME CAROL BLACK | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Sarah Elizabeth Helen Cook | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Poole | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RUSSELL GREATREX | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
RANDEEP KAUR KULAR | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83m | £3.05m | £3.19m | £3.38m | £4.00m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.82m | £3.05m | £3.15m | £3.35m | £3.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.72m | £845.62k | £708.74k | £1.04m | £1.34m | |
|
Income from government grants | £86.86k | £27.92k | £21.08k | N/A | £286.75k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.82m | £2.96m | £3.19m | £3.36m | £3.96m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.26k | £34 | £160 | £4.18k | £27.74k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £95.18k | £300 | £17.07k | £21.15k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.82m | £3.05m | £3.15m | £3.35m | £3.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £79.51k | £76.80k | £77.36k | £87.36k | £90.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.56k | £41.81k | £35.13k | £11.68k | £22.09k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.46m | £2.76m | £3.36m | £2.85m | £2.87m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.09m | £1.41m | £1.96m | £1.39m | £1.34m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/05/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/2001 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/10/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/11/2013
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1.1 TO PROMOTE THE INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THIS OBJECT) BY UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND PROVIDING ADVICE AND CONSULTANCY DESIGNED TO CONTRIBUTE TO SUSTAINABLE IMPROVEMENTS IN EMPLOYMENT POLICY AND HUMAN RESOURCE MANAGEMENT AND DISSEMINATING RESEARCH FINDINGS, IN ORDER TO INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING AND IMPROVE THE PRACTICE OF DECISION MAKERS IN PUBLIC POLICY BODIES AND EMPLOYING ORGANISATIONS; 3.1.2 TO DEVELOP AND ADVANCE THE STUDY OF EMPLOYMENT POLICY AND HUMAN RESOURCE MANAGEMENT DRAWING ON A WIDE RANGE OF DISCIPLINES IN THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC SCIENCES, AND THROUGH THE USE OF QUALITATIVE AND QUANTITATIVE RESEARCH METHODS; AND 3.1.3 (SAVE FOR PURPOSES INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE OBJECTS), NO OTHER PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
City Gate
185 Dyke Road
Brighton
BN3 1TL
- Phone:
- 01273763423
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window