THE PETER WARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports organisations and individuals known to the trustees, usually within the Oxfordshire area. The charity does not normally consider unsolicited applications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 16 April 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW FREDERICK RICE | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARQUESS OF WORCESTER HENRY ROBERT FITZROY JOHN WORCESTER | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.22k | £4.80k | £5.12k | £7.08k | £11.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.64k | £37.26k | £42.60k | £40.82k | £32.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 18TH MARCH 1968
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Estate Office
Cornwell Manor
Cornwell
CHIPPING NORTON
Oxfordshire
OX7 6TT
- Phone:
- 01608 696243
- Email:
- info@cornwellmanor.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window