Trustees ACTON AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 258406
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debbie Cornock | Chair | 24 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Whitfield | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Stubbs | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matt Ascroft | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dean Cornock | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Irene Hancock | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gemma O'Donnell | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FOSTER | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Coles Caroline | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Bradney | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT EARL | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.