LIVERPOOL WELSH CHORAL UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the society are the study and practice of choral music in order to foster the public knowledge and appreciation of such music by means of public performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 06 May 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ioan WARDHAUGH | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
George JONES | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
aNNE wILLIAMS | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
WENDY CHARLTON | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA HAMILTON | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL DAVIES | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON SHEAD | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Rigby | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|||||
STELLA MARIS MCGANN | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Catherine Mary Orrell | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geraldine Rose Boocock | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|||||
WENA EVANS | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.00k | £156.37k | £36.34k | £41.38k | £77.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.00k | £15.29k | £45.43k | £60.58k | £102.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AMENDED RULES OF THE SOCIETY ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTISE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Vicarage Close
Mossley Hill
LIVERPOOL
L18 7HU
- Phone:
- 07713435925
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window